Dabbo, Samer (CPSO#: 95695)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Oct 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Radiology
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 340-3111
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMER DABBO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DABBO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 29 Apr 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 30 Apr 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 2017