Dabee, Vassant (CPSO#: 26359)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Edinburgh, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: CHEO Medical Records 401 Smyth Road Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Date Received: 03 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 07 Mar 1977 RCPSC Specialist
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 15 Sep 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Feb 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017