Dabidiyan, Afshin (CPSO#: 106358)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Aug 2017

Expiry Date:  15 Aug 2020

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 16 Aug 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Jack Nathan Health Medical Clinic
675 Upper James Street
Hamilton ON  L9C 2Z5
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Aug 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 22 Sep 2015
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 15 Aug 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 16 Aug 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  Afshin  Dabidiyan may practise family medicine at Jack Nathan Health
                  Medical Clinic  in Hamilton, Ontario, while under supervision coordinated
                  by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

            2.    The certificate of  registration  automatically  expires three years from
                  the  date  of issuance or when Dr. Dabidiyan's eligibility  to  take  the
                  College of Family  Physicians  of  Canada  examination expires, whichever
                  comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews  the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns  regarding  Dr.
                        Dabidiyan's  knowledge,  skill,  judgment  or  attitude,  does  not
                        provide  the  required reports to the College by the due date or if
                        the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing  to  continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Dabidiyan's practice.
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is  issued  on  August 16, 2017, and will expire on or
                  before August 15, 2020, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.