Dackiw, Alan Paul Borden (CPSO#: 64147)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Apr 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Apr 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Sep 1996
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Apr 2004