Dacosta, Alric Benedict (CPSO#: 29429)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 26 Oct 1993

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Edinburgh, 1941

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Underserviced Area Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 May 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1977
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 26 Oct 1993