Dacosta, Granville Arman (CPSO#: 20447)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jul 1966

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 1966

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
567 Christie Street
Toronto ON  M6G 3E4
Phone: (647) 343-1234
Fax: (416) 651-9192
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Jamaica

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 28 Nov 1966 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GRANVILLE ARMAN DACOSTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DACOSTA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1966