Dadgostar, Anali (CPSO#: 97080)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 05 Dec 2011 to 12 Feb 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Feb 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Aug 2016