Dadjo-Guewa, Batowa Stephane (CPSO#: 89939)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Feb 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Feb 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, French

Education:Shanghai Medical University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
university of Ottawa health
Services
300-100 Marie Curie Pvt
Ottawa ON  K1N6N5
Phone: (613) 564-3950
Fax: (613) 564-6627
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Centre de sante communautaire de
L'Estrie Crysler
1, rue Nation, Crysler (ON)
Crysler ON  K0A 1R0
Canada
Phone: 613-987-2683
Fax: 613-987-9908
County: County of Stormont, Dundas and Glengarry
Electoral District: 07

300-100 Marie Curie Pvt
Ottawa, ON
Ottawa ON  K1N 6N5
Canada
Phone: 613-564-3950
Fax: 613-564-6627
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Feb 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BATOWA STEPHANE DADJO-GUEWA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DADJO-GUEWA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 21 Oct 2008 to 12 Jan 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 13 Jan 2009 to 20 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 21 Oct 2009 to 20 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 21 Oct 2010 to 25 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2011