Dadmarzi, Elmira (CPSO#: 106356)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Glazier Medical Centre
11 Gibb Street
Oshawa ON  L1H 2J9
Phone: 905-579-1212
Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Iran

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELMIRA DADMARZI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DADMARZI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 22 Sep 2015
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2017