Dafoe, Joan Marie (CPSO#: 79330)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Aug 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Aug 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone: (705) 324-6111
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOAN MARIE DAFOE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAFOE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Jul 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2004 to 31 Jul 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2005
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2006

Concerns

Source: QA Committee
Active Date: May 15, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

Where the Quality Assurance Committee has made a decision on or after June 1, 2016 in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”), the College By-laws require that the elements of the SCERP be posted on the register. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the Quality Assurance Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

On May 15, 2018, the Quality Assurance Committee (“QAC”) required emergency medicine physician, Dr. Joan Marie Dafoe, to complete a specified continuing education and remediation program (“SCERP”). The SCERP requires Dr. Dafoe to:

• Attend and provide proof of successful completion of the following courses:
o AIME: Airway Intervention and Management in Emergencies
o CMPA Record Keeping eLearning Modules:
Documentation: Charting Medical Records eLearning Module
Documentation II: Principles of Medical Record Keeping eLearning Module
o ATLS: Advanced Trauma Life Support

• Practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 6 months.

• Review materials in preparation for the Examination of Added Competence in Emergency Medicine (CCFP(EM)).

• Review the following policies, guidelines or tools with reference to how each is applicable to family medicine:
o UpToDate- Management of bleeding in patients receiving direct oral anticoagulants
o UpToDate: Management of warfarin-associated bleeding in supratherapeutic INR
o CPSO Medical Records Policy

• Submit proof of successful completion of the CCFP(EM) Certification Examination.