Dafoe, William Allan Roy (CPSO#: 50319)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Feb 1983

Summary

Former Name: Dafoe, William Alan Roy (used until: 30 Aug 1983 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
13-130E Clinical Sciences Building
11350 83 Avenue
Edmonton AB  T6G 2G3
Phone: (780) 248-2055
Fax: (780) 248-1611

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 02 Dec 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM ALLAN ROY DAFOE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAFOE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Feb 1983