Dag-Ellams, Ugonwa (CPSO#: 81859)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Sep 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Sep 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:Justus Liebig University of Giessen, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kelso Lake Medical Centre
Unit 2
1079 Maple Avenue
Milton ON  L9T 0A5
Phone: (905) 876-1011
Fax: (905) 876-3401
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ugonwa Dag-Ellams Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 26 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. U. Dag-Ellams ( CPSO# 81859 )

Business Address:
James Snow Parkway Medical Clinic
51 James Snow Parkway North
Milton ON  L9T 0R3
Phone Number: (905) 636-1050

Business Address:
Unit 2
1079 Maple Avenue
Milton ON  L9T 0A5
Phone Number: (905) 876-1011

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Aug 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. UGONWA DAG-ELLAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAG-ELLAMS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 27 Aug 2004 to 17 Nov 2004
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 18 Nov 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 26 Aug 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 27 Aug 2005 to 26 Aug 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Nov 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2006