Dagenais, Caroline (CPSO#: 84102)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pek and Dagenais Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 9 2011

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jul 2011