Dagenais, Michel H (CPSO#: 60496)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Montreal, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 22 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jul 1989