Dagg, Paul Kenneth Bronson (CPSO#: 56681)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 21 Apr 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Apr 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 11 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Apr 2006