Dagher, Alain (CPSO#: 60978)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 28 Oct 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Oct 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 21 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Oct 1996