Daglish, Thomas Edward (CPSO#: 22815)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 08 Nov 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Nov 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Apr 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1983
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 08 Nov 1996