Dagnone, Andrew Joel (CPSO#: 75785)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 406
190 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9C 5N2
Phone: (416) 622-2700
Fax: (416) 622-4355
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Queensway Health Centre
Trillium Health Partners
Etobicoke ON  M9C 1A5
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew Joel Dagnone Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 07 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Dagnone ( CPSO# 75785 )

Business Address:
Queensway Professional Centre
406 - 190 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9C 5N2
Phone Number: (416) 622-2702

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 18 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW JOEL DAGNONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAGNONE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 02 Jan 2001 to 31 Mar 2001
Elective Trainee - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2003