Dagum, Alexander Bee (CPSO#: 58351)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Ottawa, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 24 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1987 to 14 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 Dec 1993
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jun 2011