Dahan, Thierry Haim Moshe (CPSO#: 62726)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 20 Nov 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Nov 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1990
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 20 Nov 1997