Dahi, Abdorrahim (CPSO#: 64621)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 13 Dec 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Dec 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Tehran, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 16 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Sep 1993
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 1993 to 30 Sep 1994
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 1994 to 31 Dec 1995
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 1995
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 13 Dec 1996