Dahle, Colin Thomas (CPSO#: 85684)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Dec 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Dec 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sydney, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cobourg Health Centre
Unit 203
316 King Street East
Cobourg ON  K9A 5R8
Phone: (905) 373-1280
Fax: (905) 373-9335
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Port Hope Extendicare
360 Croft Street
Port Hope ON  L1A 4K8
Canada
Phone: (905) 885-126
Fax: (905) 885-5328
County: County of Northumberland
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Dec 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. COLIN THOMAS DAHLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAHLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Nov 2006 to 23 Jan 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 24 Jan 2007 to 31 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Nov 2007 to 20 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Oct 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Dec 2008