Dahlke, Erin Jade (CPSO#: 88329)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Dec 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B1
Phone: (416) 323-7546
Fax: (416) 323-6236
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
471 8EW
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Canada
Phone: 416-603-5800 Ext. 5153
Fax: 416 603 2782
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Albany Medical Clinic
807 Broadview Ave
Toronto ON  M4K 2P8
Canada
Phone: 416-461-9471
Fax: (416) 461-2710
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Adelaide Health Clinic
1 First Canadian Place
PO Box 228
Toronto ON  M5X 1C8
Canada
Phone: 416 367 5200
Fax: 416 367 1640
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Canada
Phone: 416-530-6000
Fax: 416-530-6050
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Mohs Micrographic Surgery
Hotel Dieu Hospital Site
116 Brock Street, C3-027
Kingston, ON, K7L 5G2
Kingston ON  K7L5G2
Canada
Phone: (613) 544-3400 Ext. 3415
Fax: (613)545-2202
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 18 Dec 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERIN JADE DAHLKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAHLKE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2013