Dahmer, Joan Marie (CPSO#: 60073)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1993