Dahmer, Mark Richard (CPSO#: 52737)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mark Dahmer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 9 2013

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: PO Box 3011 Dryden, Ontario P8N 1W9
Date Received: 21 Jun 2013

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jun 2013