Dain, Robert Philip (CPSO#: 52570)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 01 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 23 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Nuclear Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Dec 1984
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2006
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 01 Jun 2007