Dain, Steven Lawrence (CPSO#: 52792)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Sep 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Woodstock Hospital
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4
Phone: (519) 421-4220
Fax: (519) 663-2957
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

395 Carrie St
Strathroy ON  N7G 3E2
Canada
Phone: 519-245-5295
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

29 Noxon St
Ingersoll ON  N5C 3V6
Canada
Phone: 519-485-1700
County: County of Oxford
Electoral District: 02

London Scoping Centre
310 Wellington Rd
London ON  N6C 4P1
Canada
Phone: 519-433-4700
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

TLC London
R40-140 Fullerton St
London ON  N6A 0A4
Canada
Phone: 877-852-2020
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Steven Dain Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 27 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Dain ( CPSO# 52792 )

Business Address:
London Scoping Centre
310 Wellington Road
London ON  N6C 4P1
Phone Number: (519) 433-4700

Business Address:
TLC London
R40-140
Fullerton Street
London ON  N6A 0A4

Business Address:
29 Noxon Street
Ingersoll ON  N5C 3V6
Phone Number: (519) 485-1700

Business Address:
Woodstock Hospital
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4
Phone Number: (519) 421-4220

Business Address:
395 Carrie Street
Strathroy ON  N7G 3J4
Phone Number: (519) 245-5295

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 05 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEVEN LAWRENCE DAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 1984