Daiter, Jeffrey Martin (CPSO#: 63822)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 04 Jul 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oak Ridges Medical Centre
Suite 403
13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Phone: (905) 773-3884
Fax: (905) 773-3544
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daiter-Varenbut Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 30 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 04 Jul 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 04 Jul 2011 Active View Details [+]
            As  from  July  4,  2011,  the  following  is  imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation  on  the  certificate of registration held  by  Dr.  Jeffrey  Martin
            Daiter, in accordance  with  an  undertaking and consent given by Dr. Daiter to
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Daiter will not perform  or  be  involved  in the provision of ultra-
                  rapid opioid detoxification ("UROD") (also known  as  anesthesia-assisted
                  rapid opioid detoxification ("AAROD")).