Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Daiter, Kenneth Alan (CPSO#: 69114)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Whitby Medical
Unit 4
3910 Brock Street North
Whitby ON  L1R 3E1
Phone: (905) 444-9493
Fax: (905) 444-9174
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

701 Rossland Rd. E.
Unit #2
Whitby ON  L1N 8Y9
Canada
Phone: 905-430-2112
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ken Daiter Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 28 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Daiter ( CPSO# 69114 )

Business Address:
Whitby Medical
3910 Brock Street North
Unit 4
Whitby ON  L1R 3E1
Phone Number: (905) 444-9493

Business Address:
701 Rossland Road East
#2
Whitby ON  L1N 8Y9
Phone Number: (905) 430-2112

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KENNETH ALAN DAITER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAITER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1997