Dakin, Edward Bolton (CPSO#: 28763)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Sep 1976

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 10 May 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Otago, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Shouldice Hospital
7750 Bayview Avenue
Thornhill ON  L3T 4A3
Phone: (905) 889-1174
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 13 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Apr 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 1976
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 May 2006
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 17 May 2007

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 17 May 2007 Active View Details [+]
            As from May 10, 2006, and amended on May 17, 2007, Dr. Edward Dakin undertakes
            to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario the following:

                  1.    I undertake and agree that I will restrict my practice from
                        performing all medical practice except as a surgical assistant
                        meaning that:
                  
                  a)    I, Dr. Edward Dakin, may only assist other physicians at the
                        Shouldice Hospital or other surgeons at any other hospital,
                        acceptable to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, in
                        their cases, at which they are present at all times;
                  b)    I cannot be the primary surgeon in any case;
                  c)    I am precluded from providing surgical care including any pre and
                        post-operative care; and
                  d)    at no time will I conduct any independent patient care.