Dal Cin, Arianna (CPSO#: 54494)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Sep 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:McMaster University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
304 Victoria Avenue North
Suite 504
Hamilton ON  L8L 5G4
Phone: (905) 526-0811
Fax: (905) 526-0890
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 20 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARIANNA DAL CIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAL CIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 31 Dec 1991
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 02 Jan 1992 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 1985