Dale, Norman Ian (CPSO#: 29836)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 12 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Oct 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013