Dales, Michael (CPSO#: 17554)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 18 Apr 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Apr 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German, Polish

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Dr. Sosiak Suite 204 3101 Bloor Street West Toronto, Ontario M8X 2W2 Tel: (416) 233-3343 Fax: (416) 233-0746
Date Received: 31 May 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1978 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1960
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Dec 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Apr 2012