Dales, Robert Edgar (CPSO#: 51407)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 May 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 May 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
Box 211
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 720-7172
Fax: (613) 737-8537
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sudbury HSN
41 Ramsay Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Canada
Phone: 705- 523-7344
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Canada
Phone: (613) 721-2000 Ext. 3800
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Timmins and District Hosptital
700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Canada
Phone: (705) 267-2131 Ext. 2316
Fax: (705) 360-6010
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert Dales Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Dales ( CPSO# 51407 )

Business Address:
700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Phone Number: (705) 267-2131

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Business Address:
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4303

Business Address:
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Respirology Effective: 06 Dec 1982 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 07 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT EDGAR DALES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DALES is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 May 1986