Dalgleish, Philp Irvine Douglas (CPSO#: 15767)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Dec 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Dec 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Access Services Canada, Inc. (RASCI) 854 Upper Canada Drive Sarnia, ON N7W 1A4 Tel: 800 971 8038 ext. 102 Website: www.rasci.ca
Date Received: 06 Apr 2017

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1956
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Apr 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Dec 2013

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: December 2, 2013
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective December 2, 2013, Dr. Dalgleish has resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.