Dalgorf, Dustin Mark (CPSO#: 86722)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2390 Bloor St. West
Toronto ON  M6S 1P5
Phone: (416) 762-8287
Fax: (416) 762-0709
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Ave, Room 401
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
Phone: (416) 586-8533
Fax: (416) 586-8600
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

491 Eglinton Ave West
Suite 101
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Canada
Phone: (416) 787-5511
Fax: (416) 787-1592
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dustin Dalgorf Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 08 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Dalgorf ( CPSO# 86722 )

Business Address:
101 - 491 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5N 1A8
Phone Number: (416) 787-5511

Business Address:
St. Joseph Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Business Address:
2390 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M6S 1P5
Phone Number: (416) 762-8287

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DUSTIN MARK DALGORF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DALGORF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2013