Daly, Lanval Joseph (CPSO#: 27674)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Aug 1975

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Aug 1975

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Suite 336
Sunnyside West
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6152
Fax: (416) 530-6830
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lanval J. Daly Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 07 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Daly ( CPSO# 27674 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Suite 336
Sunnyside West
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6152

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 14 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LANVAL JOSEPH DALY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DALY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1971
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1975

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence

On March 15, 2012, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice in Toronto, a finding of Professional Negligence was made against Dr. Daly.