Daly, Laura Ann (CPSO#: 82691)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
East Wellington Family Health Team
6 Thompson Crescent
Erin ON  N0B 1T0
Phone: (519) 833-9396
Fax: (519) 833-9838
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Laura Daly Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 24 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Daly ( CPSO# 82691 )

Business Address:
East Wellington Family Health Team
6 Thompson Crescent
Suite 1
Erin ON  N0B 1T0
Phone Number: (519) 833-9396

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAURA ANN DALY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DALY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2007