Daly, Mary Margaret (CPSO#: 43327)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 May 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 May 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 06 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 May 2002