Dam, Olivia Mayin (CPSO#: 74756)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 23 May 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 23 May 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 May 2006