Damboragama, Shyamali Niranjala (CPSO#: 88101)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Mar 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Feb 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Sinhalese

Education:North Colombo Medical College, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Avenue Medical Centre
221 Brant Avenue
Brantford ON  N3T 3J3
Phone: (519) 753-8666 Ext. 301
Fax: (519) 753-6880
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

33 , city centre Drive
Mississauga
Mississauga ON  L5B 2N5
Canada
Phone: (905) 507-1111
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Damboragama Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 24 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Damboragama ( CPSO# 88101 )

Business Address:
33 City Centre Drive
Mississauga ON  L5B 2N5

Business Address:
Avenue Medical Centre
221 Brant Avenue
Brantford ON  N3T 3J3
Phone Number: (519) 753-8666

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Feb 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHYAMALI NIRANJALA DAMBORAGAMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAMBORAGAMA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Mar 2008 to 23 May 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 May 2008 to 28 Feb 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Mar 2009 to 28 Feb 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Mar 2010 to 02 Mar 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 May 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 2010