Damji, Alkarim (CPSO#: 61016)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Kachchi, Swahili

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 2
1701 Martingrove Road
Rexdale ON  M9V 4N4
Phone: (416) 744-0461
Fax: (416) 744-3356
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1701 Martingrove Road, #2
Rexdale ON  M9V 4N4
Canada
Phone: (416) 742-9888
Fax: (416) 742-7802
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alkarim Damji Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 11 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Damji ( CPSO# 61016 )

Business Address:
2 - 1701 Martin Grove Road
Rexdale ON  M9V 4N4
Phone Number: (416) 742-9988

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALKARIM DAMJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAMJI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1990