Damji, Karim Fatehali (CPSO#: 61881)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Kachchi

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 26 Oct 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Jun 2010