Damla, Garo (CPSO#: 57522)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Armenian, English, French, German, Turkish

Education:University of Vienna, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rouge Valley Health System
Centenary Hospital
Suite 301
2863 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 5E9
Phone: (416) 282-0132
Fax: (416) 282-2126
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Garo Damla Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Damla ( CPSO# 57522 )

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Health System
Centenary Hospital
301 - 2863 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 5E9
Phone Number: (416) 282-0132

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Massachusetts

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 May 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GARO DAMLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAMLA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1987