Damodaran, Somanathan (CPSO#: 110687)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Oct 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Oct 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Tamil Nadu Dr M G R Medical University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Riverview Medical Centre
2817 Riverside Dr
Ottawa ON  K1V 8N4
Phone: 613-789-1000
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Aug 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SOMANATHAN DAMODARAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAMODARAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Jul 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 2017