Dan, Ratna (CPSO#: 58940)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Aug 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 1989


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of the West Indies, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
c/o C M L
300 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J1
Phone: (905) 426-8947
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Dan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 19 2008

Dr. R. Dan ( CPSO# 58940 )

Business Address:
300 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J1

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora


Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 25 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. RATNA DAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1987
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1987
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 05 Aug 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1989