Da'na, Waleed Kamel Fuad (CPSO#: 111100)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 16 Oct 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Oct 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Kharkov Medical University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Oct 2016 to 16 Dec 2016
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 17 Dec 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 16 Oct 2017
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Oct 2017