Dancel, Mary Lou Mamuri (CPSO#: 42475)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 May 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 28 Sep 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tagalog

Education:University of Santo Tomas, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
219 Sherbrooke St., 2nd Floor
Peterborough ON  K9J 2N2
Phone: (705) 868-2704
Fax: (705) 745-1023
Electoral District: 06

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 08 Jun 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 03 May 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 1983
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2015
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 27 Nov 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 27 Nov 2015 Active View Details [+]


            As from September 28, 2015, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr.Mary Lou Mamuri
            Dancel, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Dancel to
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")
                                                  of
                                      DR. MARY LOU MAMURI DANCEL
                                            ("Dr. Dancel")
                                                  to 
                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                              ("College")

            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   I, Dr. Dancel, certificate of registration number 42475, am a member of
                  the College.  The College has received information regarding my standard
                  of practice.

            (2)   I, Dr. Dancel, acknowledge that I am currently the subject of College
                  investigations bearing File Numbers 7213807 and 7213979
                  ("Investigations") into allegations that I do not meet the standard of
                  care in my practice and that I lack knowledge, skill and judgment.

            (3)   I, Dr. Dancel, acknowledge that, upon receiving an original copy of this
                  Undertaking as signed by me, the College has agreed to take no further
                  action on the Investigations. 

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Dancel, acknowledge and agree that I am bound by this Undertaking
                  from the date on which I sign it.

            (5)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Dancel, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor(s) acceptable to the College ("Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), for twelve (12) months ("Clinical Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Dancel, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s). The
                        Clinical Supervisor(s) will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP") attached as Appendix
                              "B";
                  
                        (ii)  Review at least five (5) of my patient charts at every visit,
                              which shall be selected by the Clinical Supervisor(s)
                              independent of my participation, on the basis of the
                              educational needs identified in the IEP set out at Appendix
                              "B", as well as the areas of concern identified in the
                              reports provided to the College by the medical inspectors,
                              dated November 15, 2013, April 25, 2014, and the reports by
                              the medical inspectors received by the College on September
                              4, 2014 and June 10, 2015 (collectively, the "Inspectors'
                              Reports") and any concerns that arise during the period of
                              Clinical Supervision;
                  
                        (iii) Meet with me once every month for the first three (3) months,
                              and thereafter, only if approved by the College, once every
                              three (3) months;
                  
                        (iv)  Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (v)   Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
                        (vi)  Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (vii) Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              quarter, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor(s) has
                              concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Dancel, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the educational
                        needs identified in the IEP set out at Appendix "B" to my
                        Undertaking, as well as the areas of concern identified in the
                        Inspectors' Reports, and concerns that may arise during the period
                        of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Dancel, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" attached, and to abide by the
                        recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Dancel, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking, is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Dancel, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Dancel, agree that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (5)(e) and/or
                        (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Dancel, agree that if I am required to cease practise as a
                        result of section (5)(g) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my Certificate of Registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (6)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Dancel, undertake to, under the guidance of my Clinical
                        Supervisor(s), participate in and successfully complete the
                        following professional education:
                  
                        (i)   all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix
                              "B"; and
                  
                        (ii)  any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor(s).
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Dancel, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided
                        to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        professional education set out in section (5)(b)(i).
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Dancel, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the professional education set out above
                        in section (5)(b)(i) as soon as possible.
                  
            (7)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Dancel, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after
                        the completion of all aspects of the Clinical Supervision set out
                        in section (5) above and Appendix "A" attached, I will submit to a
                        reassessment of my practice ("Reassessment") by an assessor or
                        assessors selected by the College ("Assessor(s)").  I acknowledge
                        and agree that the Reassessment may include a chart review, direct
                        observation of my care, interviews with colleagues and co-workers,
                        feedback from patients and any other tools deemed necessary by the
                        College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Dancel, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment,
                        conducted under the term of this Undertaking, and to abide by those
                        recommendations of the Assessor(s) that are approved by the
                        Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee ("ICRC").
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Dancel, acknowledge and agree that my Clinical Supervisor(s)
                        may receive and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may
                        discuss with the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from
                        the Reassessment.  I also acknowledge that the results of the
                        Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        the report may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Dancel, understand and agree that if I am of the view that
                        any of the Assessor(s)'s recommendations are unreasonable, I will
                        have thirty (30) days following my receipt of the recommendations
                        within which to provide the College with my submissions in this
                        regard.  I further understand and agree that thereafter, the ICRC
                        will consider my submissions and make a determination regarding
                        whether or not the recommendations, or any of them, are reasonable
                        and if so, whether they, or any of them, constitute limitations or
                        restrictions on my practice, and that decision will be provided to
                        me.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Dancel, undertake that, following the decision referenced in
                        section (7)(d) above, I will abide by those recommendations of the
                        Assessor(s) that the ICRC has determined are reasonable. 
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Dancel, hereby consent to the inclusion, on the public
                        register as a term, condition or limitation on my certificate of
                        registration, for the purposes of Section 23 of the Health
                        Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated
                        Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended, of any
                        of those recommendations of the Assessor(s) which are limitations
                        and restrictions on my practice and which the ICRC has identified
                        in its decision referenced in section (7)(d) as limitations and
                        restrictions on my practice.
                  
            (8)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Dancel, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within
                        fifteen (15) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I
                        further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Dancel, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Dancel, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan
                        ("OHIP"), and/or any person or institution who may have relevant
                        information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with
                        the provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Dancel, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
                        form, attached hereto as Appendix "C". 
                  
            (9)   I, Dr. Dancel, undertake to comply with this Undertaking and acknowledge
                  that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute
                  an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in
                  a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee of the
                  College.

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (10)  I, Dr. Dancel, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (11)  I, Dr. Dancel, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for payment
                  of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (12)  I, Dr. Dancel, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand
                  the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent
                  legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived
                  my right to do so.

            (13)  I, Dr. Dancel, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes
                  terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for
                  the purposes of section 23 of the Health Professions Procedural Code,
                  which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O.
                  1991, c. 18, as amended. I understand that this Undertaking shall be
                  information on the College's Register that is available to the public
                  during the time period that the Undertaking remains in effect.

            (14)  I, Dr. Dancel, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on the
                  College's Register that is available to the public during the time period
                  that this Undertaking remains in effect:

                  Dr. Dancel was the subject of College investigations into allegations
                  that she fell below the standard of care in her record-keeping, treatment
                  and care in her psychiatric practice. As a result of the investigations:
                  
                        Dr. Dancel will practise under the guidance of a Clinical
                        Supervisor acceptable to the College for twelve (12) months. 
                  
                        Dr. Dancel will engage in professional education pertaining to her
                        care and treatment of patients, including in her prescribing and
                        record-keeping.
                  
                        Dr. Dancel's practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by
                        the College within six (6) months of the completion of all aspects
                        of the education program.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (15)  I, Dr. Dancel, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the professional education set
                  out in section (6) above and to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or
                  Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (16)  I, Dr. Dancel, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities approved by the College, at any Practice Location
                  ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and to provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any
                  information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering
                  into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring
                  of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (17)  I, Dr. Dancel, give my irrevocable consent to any person who facilitates
                  my completion of the professional education set out in section (6) above,
                  and to all Clinical Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to
                  disclose to the College, and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A";
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (e)   which comes to his or her attention in the course of providing the
                        education set out at section (6) above and which he or she
                        reasonably believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my
                        patients.
                  

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: September 28, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Mary Lou Mamuri Dancel to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective September 28, 2015:

Dr. Dancel was the subject of College investigations into allegations that she fell below the standard of care in her record-keeping, treatment and care in her psychiatric practice. As a result of the investigations:

- Dr. Dancel will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for twelve (12) months.

- Dr. Dancel will engage in professional education pertaining to her care and treatment of patients, including in her prescribing and record-keeping.

- Dr. Dancel's practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within six (6) months of the completion of all aspects of the education program.