Dancey, David Ross (CPSO#: 68096)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
6633 Highway 7 East
Suite 302
Markham ON  L3P 7P2
Phone: (905) 471-4402
Fax: (905) 471-1903
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Centre For Respiratory Health
Markham Stouffville Hospital
377 Church Street Suite G07
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Canada
Phone: (905) 472-7614
Fax: (905) 472-7618
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dancey Tupchong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 23 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Dancey ( CPSO# 68096 )
Dr. M. Tupchong ( CPSO# 68193 )

Business Address:
302 - 6633 Highway 7 East
Markham ON  L3P 7P2
Phone Number: (905) 471-4402

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 22 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID ROSS DANCEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DANCEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1998