Dancey, Janet Ellen (CPSO#: 59557)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queen's University
Canadian Cancer Trials Group
10 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2N6
Phone: (613) 533-6430
Fax: (613) 533-2411
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANET ELLEN DANCEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DANCEY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1989